This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/18/2020 at 18:00:29 (UTC).

CENTURY GROUP PROFESSIONALS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS GLOBAL EAGLE ENTERTAINMENT, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 06/12/2019 CENTURY GROUP PROFESSIONALS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GLOBAL EAGLE ENTERTAINMENT, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0450

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CENTURY GROUP PROFESSIONALS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

GLOBAL EAGLE ENTERTAINMENT INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEIGHTON JOANNE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/12/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/12/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/12/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/12/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/17/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Amended Complaint

6/17/2019: Amended Complaint

Notice of Status Conference and Order

6/17/2019: Notice of Status Conference and Order

Proof of Personal Service

6/27/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

7/17/2019: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Initial Status Conference (and proof of service as to all parties) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Century Group Professionals, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Century Group Professionals, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Century Group Professionals, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Docketamended complaint; Filed by Century Group Professionals, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by Century Group Professionals, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Century Group Professionals, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Century Group Professionals, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Century Group Professionals, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLOBAL EAGLE ENTERTAINMENT INC. A DELAWARE CORPROATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Century Group Professionals, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEIGHTON JOANNE