This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/02/2022 at 01:11:51 (UTC).

CENTURY CITY MALL, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY VS SUGAR FACTORY CENTURY CITY LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/03/2021 CENTURY CITY MALL, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SUGAR FACTORY CENTURY CITY LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0636

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

CENTURY CITY MALL LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY

Defendants

DOWN AND DIRTY TACOS AND TEQUILA BAR MEATPACKING LLC A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SUGAR FACTORY BROADWAY LLC A NEVADA LIMITED COMPANY

SUGAR FACTORY CENTURY CITY LLC A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SUGAR FACTORY LV BLVD LLC A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

SUGAR FACTORY CENTURY CITY LLC A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACZEK MEEGAN I.

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

STILLMAN PHILIP H.

Cross Defendant Attorney

KORMAN GREGORY S.

 

Court Documents

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE PLAINTIFF'S SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE STRATEGIC LAWSUIT AGAINST PUBLIC PARTICIPATION (ANTI-SLAPP MOTION)

7/21/2022: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE PLAINTIFF'S SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE STRATEGIC LAWSUIT AGAINST PUBLIC PARTICIPATION (ANTI-SLAPP MOTION)

Request for Dismissal

7/26/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

7/27/2022: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/21/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Trial - NOTICE OF TRIAL SCHEDULING FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/22/2022: Notice of Trial - NOTICE OF TRIAL SCHEDULING FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement

3/3/2022: Case Management Statement

Motion re: - MOTION RE: TO STRIKE STRATEGIC LAWSUIT AGAINST PUBLIC PARTICIPATION (ANTI-SLAPP MOTION)

2/2/2022: Motion re: - MOTION RE: TO STRIKE STRATEGIC LAWSUIT AGAINST PUBLIC PARTICIPATION (ANTI-SLAPP MOTION)

Notice - NOTICE COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE STRATEGIC LAWSUIT AGAINST PUBLIC PARTICIPATION (ANTI-SLAPP MOTION)

2/2/2022: Notice - NOTICE COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE STRATEGIC LAWSUIT AGAINST PUBLIC PARTICIPATION (ANTI-SLAPP MOTION)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/2/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

12/30/2021: Answer

Notice of Related Case

11/5/2021: Notice of Related Case

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

11/15/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/15/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/15/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Cross-Complaint

11/30/2021: Cross-Complaint

Answer

11/30/2021: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/3/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

11/3/2021: Complaint

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/27/2022

DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Century City Mall, LLC, a Delaware limited liability (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2022

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Century City Mall, LLC, a Delaware limited liability (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2022

DocketStipulation - No Order (Stipulation to Continue Plaintiff's Special Motion to Strike Strategic Lawsuit Against Public Participation (Anti-SLAPP Motion)); Filed by Century City Mall, LLC, a Delaware limited liability (Cross-Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2022

DocketNotice of Trial (SCHEDULING FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Century City Mall, LLC, a Delaware limited liability (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2022

Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2022

DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/03/2022

DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Century City Mall, LLC, a Delaware limited liability (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2022

DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Century City Mall, LLC, a Delaware limited liability (Cross-Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2022

DocketNotice (Compendium of Evidence in Support of Plaintiff's Special Motion to Strike Strategic Lawsuit Against Public Participation (Anti-SLAPP Motion)); Filed by Century City Mall, LLC, a Delaware limited liability (Cross-Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2022

DocketMotion re: (to Strike Strategic Lawsuit Against Public Participation (Anti-SLAPP Motion)); Filed by Century City Mall, LLC, a Delaware limited liability (Cross-Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
11/15/2021

DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Century City Mall, LLC, a Delaware limited liability (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2021

DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Century City Mall, LLC, a Delaware limited liability (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2021

DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Century City Mall, LLC, a Delaware limited liability (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/05/2021

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/05/2021

DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Management Conference]); Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/05/2021

DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Century City Mall, LLC, a Delaware limited liability (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2021

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Century City Mall, LLC, a Delaware limited liability (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2021

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2021

DocketComplaint; Filed by Century City Mall, LLC, a Delaware limited liability (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2021

DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Century City Mall, LLC, a Delaware limited liability (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less