This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/28/2021 at 00:46:33 (UTC).

CENTURY CITY MALL, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS THE COLLECTED GROUP RETAIL, LLC, A NEW YORK LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/20/2020 CENTURY CITY MALL, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against THE COLLECTED GROUP RETAIL, LLC, A NEW YORK LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4674

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CENTURY CITY MALL LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

THE COLLECTED GROUP RETAIL LLC A NEW YORK LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KORMAN GREGORY S.

LARSEN RYAN J.

MACZEK MEEGAN I.

Defendant Attorney

ANTONI JOHN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/23/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/23/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/20/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/20/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

11/20/2020: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

12/1/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

12/23/2020: Answer

Case Management Statement

4/27/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/22/2021

4/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/22/2021

Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

4/19/2021: Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

9/16/2021: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

9/14/2021: Request for Dismissal

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Century City Mall, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Century City Mall, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by The Collected Group Retail, LLC, a New York limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • Docketat 2:41 PM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/22/2021); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy); Filed by The Collected Group Retail, LLC, a New York limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by The Collected Group Retail, LLC, a New York limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Century City Mall, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Century City Mall, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Century City Mall, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Century City Mall, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less