This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/20/2022 at 02:42:32 (UTC).

CENTRAL BASIN MUNICIPAL WATER DISTRICT, A CALIFORNIA PUBLIC AGENCY VS LETICIA VASQUEZ-WILSON

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 CENTRAL BASIN MUNICIPAL WATER DISTRICT, A CALIFORNIA PUBLIC AGENCY filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against LETICIA VASQUEZ-WILSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BARBARA M. SCHEPER, MICHAEL L. STERN, MARY H. STROBEL and MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6320

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

MICHAEL L. STERN

MARY H. STROBEL

MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CENTRAL BASIN MUNICIPAL WATER DISTRICT

Defendant

VASQUEZ-WILSON LETICIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BAKER ROBERT C. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

WILSON RONALD NOLAN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH SERVI...)

5/17/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH SERVI...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH SERVI...) OF 05/17/2022

5/17/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH SERVI...) OF 05/17/2022

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT, LETICIA VASQUEZ-WILSON'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF DERRICK S. LOWE

5/4/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT, LETICIA VASQUEZ-WILSON'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF DERRICK S. LOWE

Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS; SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF LETICIA VASQUEZ; SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHOR

5/6/2022: Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS; SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF LETICIA VASQUEZ; SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHOR

Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS; SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF LETICIA VASQUEZ; SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITES AND OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATIONS

5/6/2022: Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS; SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF LETICIA VASQUEZ; SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITES AND OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATIONS

Unknown - OBJECTION TO ADD-ON PETITION DEFENDANT LETICIA VASQUEZ'S OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATIONS OF DERRICK LOWE AND DEREK LEE

5/6/2022: Unknown - OBJECTION TO ADD-ON PETITION DEFENDANT LETICIA VASQUEZ'S OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATIONS OF DERRICK LOWE AND DEREK LEE

Declaration - DECLARATION NOTICE OF FILING OF DECLARATION OF MAILING AND DECLARATION OF MAILING

3/29/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION NOTICE OF FILING OF DECLARATION OF MAILING AND DECLARATION OF MAILING

Motion to Quash Service of Summons

3/30/2022: Motion to Quash Service of Summons

Declaration - DECLARATION OF RONALD WILSON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS

3/30/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF RONALD WILSON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS

Declaration - DECLARATION OF LETICIA VASQUEZ IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS

3/30/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF LETICIA VASQUEZ IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

4/4/2022: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE;)

4/6/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE;) OF 04/06/2022

4/6/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE;) OF 04/06/2022

Request - REQUEST REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION OF MINUTE ORDER

4/7/2022: Request - REQUEST REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION OF MINUTE ORDER

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

4/13/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/14/2022

4/14/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/14/2022

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/14/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2022
  • Hearing07/01/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • Docketat 09:45 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • Docketat 09:45 AM in Department 62; Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons ((ID 777102712415)) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion to Quash Servi...) of 05/17/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion to Quash Servi...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30; Order to Show Cause Re: (Service) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30; Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketReply (TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS; SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF LETICIA VASQUEZ; SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITES AND OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATIONS); Filed by Leticia Vasquez-Wilson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketSupplemental Declaration (REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS; SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF LETICIA VASQUEZ; SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITES AND OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATIONS); Filed by Leticia Vasquez-Wilson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Leticia Vasquez in Opposition to Ex Parte TRO Application); Filed by Leticia Vasquez-Wilson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application Plaintiff's for t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORD...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application (Plaintiff's notice of ex parte and ex parte application for temporary restraining order); Filed by Central Basin Municipal Water District (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application (PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF EX PARTE AND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF ROBERT); Filed by Central Basin Municipal Water District (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Central Basin Municipal Water District (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Central Basin Municipal Water District (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Central Basin Municipal Water District (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENTRAL BASIN MUNICIPAL WATER DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILSON RONALD N. ESQ.