Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/06/2021 at 21:34:14 (UTC).

CENTERONE FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF VCFS AUTO LEASING COMPANY VS MATTHEW R. MCGURK

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 CENTERONE FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF VCFS AUTO LEASING COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MATTHEW R MCGURK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0616

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CENTERONE FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF VCFS AUTO LEASING COMPANY

Defendant

MCGURK MATTHEW R. AKA MATTHEW MCGURK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRAZIANO JOSEPH PETER

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/5/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/5/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/6/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/6/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • Hearing10/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Centerone Financial Services LLC as Assignee of VCFS Auto Leasing Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Centerone Financial Services LLC as Assignee of VCFS Auto Leasing Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Centerone Financial Services LLC as Assignee of VCFS Auto Leasing Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Centerone Financial Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRAZIANO JOSEPH PETER