This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/27/2023 at 04:53:04 (UTC).

CENDEJAS, HUBER VS PAZ, BLANCA

Case Summary

On 06/08/2022 CENDEJAS, HUBER filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against PAZ, BLANCA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is AHARONOV, AMIR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1005

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

AHARONOV, AMIR

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CENDEJAS HUBER

Respondent

PAZ BLANCA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

VALENCIA EVERARDO VARGAS

 

Court Documents

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - GRANTED

6/8/2022: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - GRANTED

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

6/8/2022: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

6/8/2022: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/8/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

6/8/2022: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Petition - Civil Harassment (non-violence)

6/8/2022: Petition - Civil Harassment (non-violence)

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

6/29/2022: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

Minute Order

6/29/2022: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

6/29/2022: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

7/20/2022: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

7/20/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/10/2022: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - [TRO terminated]

8/10/2022: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - [TRO terminated]

Request - Dismissal - filed and entered (with prejudice)

8/25/2022: Request - Dismissal - filed and entered (with prejudice)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketRequest - Dismissal (filed and entered (with prejudice) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department F50, Aharonov, Amir, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) ([TRO terminated] ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department F50, Aharonov, Amir, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment (non-violence); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (Terminated per Court order on 8/10/22 ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109) (GRANTED ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less