This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/23/2023 at 15:27:03 (UTC).

CELEBRATED CONSULTING, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS VENTURA INVESTMENT COMPANY, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/27/2021 CELEBRATED CONSULTING, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VENTURA INVESTMENT COMPANY, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MONICA BACHNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7629

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MONICA BACHNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CELEBRATED CONSULTING INC.

GEMILYAN ARA

Defendant

VENTURA INVESTMENT COMPANY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARALAN SAM B.

Defendant Attorney

SMITH MARC

 

Court Documents

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)

3/6/2023: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/2/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

1/24/2023: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ARA GEMILYAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR RELIEF

1/23/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ARA GEMILYAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR RELIEF

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SHOLOM GOODMAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR RELIEF

1/23/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SHOLOM GOODMAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR RELIEF

Motion re: - MOTION RE: FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER DEEMING ADMITTED REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION

1/23/2023: Motion re: - MOTION RE: FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER DEEMING ADMITTED REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND CONTINUE TRIAL

1/18/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND CONTINUE TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

1/18/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/18/2023

1/18/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/18/2023

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER PROTECTIVE

12/8/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER PROTECTIVE

Substitution of Attorney

11/1/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Ruling

10/31/2022: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING WHY $500 SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT B...)

10/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING WHY $500 SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT B...)

Motion for Terminating Sanctions

10/19/2022: Motion for Terminating Sanctions

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO COMPEL

10/3/2022: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO COMPEL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MOTION OF DEFENDANT, VENTURA INVESTMENT COMPANY, LLC, FOR AN ...)

10/3/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MOTION OF DEFENDANT, VENTURA INVESTMENT COMPANY, LLC, FOR AN ...)

Order - RULING

10/3/2022: Order - RULING

Notice of OSC - NOTICE OF OSC (NAME EXTENSION) OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING SANCTIONS

9/30/2022: Notice of OSC - NOTICE OF OSC (NAME EXTENSION) OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING SANCTIONS

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2023
  • Hearing10/02/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2023
  • Hearing09/21/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • Hearing06/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion - Other Relief from Order Deeming Admitted Requests for Admission

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketAmended Complaint (2nd); Filed by: Celebrated Consulting, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Ventura Investment Company, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketStipulation and Order Granting Leave to File Second Amended Complaint; Signed and Filed by: Ara Gemilyan (Plaintiff); Celebrated Consulting, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Ventura Investment Company, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order Granting Leave to File Second Amended Complaint: Filed By: Ara Gemilyan (Plaintiff),Celebrated Consulting, LLC (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 03/02/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by: Celebrated Consulting, LLC (Plaintiff); ARA GEMILYAN (Plaintiff); As to: Ventura Investment Company, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions scheduled for 02/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 71 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 01/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketMotion re: FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER DEEMING ADMITTED REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION; Filed by: Celebrated Consulting, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Ventura Investment Company, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Ara Gemilyan in Support of Motion for Relief; Filed by: Celebrated Consulting, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
94 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 71

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Monica Bachner in Department 71 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketAddress for Sholom Y. Goodman (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Celebrated Consulting, LLC (Plaintiff): Organization Name changed from Celebrated Consulting, LLC, a California limited liability company to Celebrated Consulting, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Ventura Investment Company, LLC (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Ventura Investment Company, LLC, a California limited liability company to Ventura Investment Company, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Celebrated Consulting, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Ventura Investment Company, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Celebrated Consulting, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Ventura Investment Company, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Celebrated Consulting, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Ventura Investment Company, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******7629 Hearing Date: October 3, 2022 Dept: 71

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

DEPARTMENT 71

TENTATIVE RULING

CELEBRATED CONSULTING, LLC,

vs.

VENTURA INVESTMENT COMPANY, LLC.

Case No.: *******7629

Hearing Date: October 3, 2020

Defendant’s unopposed motion to deem Requests for Admission (Set One) admitted against Plaintiff is granted. Defendant’s unopposed motion to compel Plaintiff to provide responses to Form Interrogatories (Set One) and Request for Production of Documents (Set One) are granted. Plaintiff is ordered to provide responses within 10 days.

Defendant’s unopposed requests for monetary sanctions against Plaintiff and its counsel of record are granted in the reduced total amount of $1,530.00, payable within 15 days.

Three discovery motions are presently before the Court. Defendant Ventura Investment Company, LLC (“Ventura Investment”) (“Defendant”), moves for an order deeming admitted the truth of matters in Requests for Admission (Set One). Defendant also moves for orders compelling Plaintiff Celebrated Consulting, LLC (“Celebrated Consulting”) (“Plaintiff”), to provide initial responses to Form Interrogatories (Set One) and Request for Production of Documents (Set One). (Notices of Motion, pg. 2.) For each of the three motions, Defendant also requests sanctions against Plaintiff and its counsel Sholom Goodman (“Goodman”) in the amount of $2,760.00, for a total amount of $8,280.00. (Notices of Motion, pg. 2.)

Defendant filed the three motions directed at Plaintiff on April 1, 2022. As of the hearing date, Defendant has not filed replies.

Defendant is entitled to an order deeming admitted the truth of matters in Requests for Admission (Set One) and an order compelling Plaintiff to provide responses to Form Interrogatories (Set One) and Request for Production (Set One). (C.C.P. 2030.290(b), 2031.300(b), 2033.280(b).) Defendant submitted evidence it propounded its first set of discovery on Plaintiff on January 20, 2022, and, after receiving no responses by the deadline, Defendant agreed to extend the discovery deadline to March 15, 2022, and Plaintiff failed to provide initial responses to any of the discovery requests. (Decls. of Smith 2; Decls. of Berman, Exh. A (as to each Declaration).)

Defendant is entitled to monetary sanctions for reasonable attorneys’ fees incurred in connection with bringing the motions. (C.C.P. 2030.290(c), 2031.300(c), 2033.280(c).) Moreover, even if Defendants serve responses to Plaintiffs’ discovery requests in advance of the hearing, Plaintiffs’ requests for monetary sanctions remain at issue. (See Sinaiko Healthcare Consulting, Inc. v. Pacific Healthcare Consultants (2007) 148 Cal.App.4th 390, 407; CRC 3.1348(a) (“The court may award sanctions under the Discovery Act in favor of a party who files a motion to compel discovery, even though … the requested discovery was provided to the moving party after the motion was filed.”).)

Defendant requests monetary sanctions in the total amount of $8,280.00, reflecting at $2,760.00 for each motion based on 2 hours drafting each motion and an anticipated 4 hours spent in preparation for and in attending the hearing on the motions at rate of $450.00 per hour, in addition to the filing fee of $60.00 per motion. (Decls. of Berman 7.) However, given the motions are to be heard together on the same day, the request for 4 hours in fees in connection with each motion is duplicative. Moreover, considering COVID-19, the parties will appear remotely at the hearing, eliminating travel time. In view of the totality of the circumstances including Defendant’s lack of reply and the similarity of the motions to each other, the Court finds the total and reasonable amount of attorney’s fees and costs incurred for the work performed in connection with the pending motions against Defendants is $1,530.

Dated: October , 2022

Hon. Monica Bachner

Judge of the Superior Court