This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:33:43 (UTC).

CEDARS SINAI MEDICAL CENTER VS HEALTHCARE PARTNERS LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/03/2017 CEDARS SINAI MEDICAL CENTER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HEALTHCARE PARTNERS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARK V. MOONEY, BARBARA M. SCHEPER, RUTH ANN KWAN and MONICA BACHNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5494

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARK V. MOONEY

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

RUTH ANN KWAN

MONICA BACHNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER

CFHS HOLDINGS INC.

Defendants and Respondents

HEALTHCARE PARTNERS MEDICAL GROUP

HELATHCARE PARTNERS LLC

HEALTHCARE PARTNERS LLC

HEALTHCARE PARTNERS AFFILIATES MEDICAL GR

DAVITA MEDICAL GROUP ASSOCIATES CAL INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

POTH JAMES L.

FOWLER KERRY C. ESQ.

FOWLER KERRY CORDILL ESQ.

POTH JAMES LENAHAN

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BELURIS TERESE A. ESQ.

MOSHER BELURIS TERESE ANNE ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Separate Statement

11/5/2018: Separate Statement

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

12/5/2018: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Ex Parte Application

12/31/2018: Ex Parte Application

Stipulation and Order

1/2/2019: Stipulation and Order

Notice

1/15/2019: Notice

Notice of Lodging

6/24/2019: Notice of Lodging

Ex Parte Application

6/26/2019: Ex Parte Application

Ex Parte Application

6/26/2019: Ex Parte Application

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

6/26/2019: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2019
  • Hearingat 09:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (Joint Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Date and Extend Deadlines) - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Set Motion for Summary Adjudication) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Ex-Parte Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Defendant's Ex-Parte Motion to Set Motion for Summary Adjudic...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Joint Ex Parte Application to...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS, HEALTHCARE PARTNERS AFFIL...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by HealthCare Partners Affiliates Medical Gr (Defendant); Davita Medical Group Associates Cal Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
126 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Cedars-Sinai Medical Center (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Cedars-Sinai Medical Center (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cedars-Sinai Medical Center (Plaintiff); CFHS Holdings, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

James L. Poth (State Bar No. 185042)

JONES DAY

~ 3161 Michelson Drive, Suite 800

? Irvine, CA 92612.4408

Telephone: +1.949.851.3939 FILED Facsimile: +1.949.553.7539 Supe- ;;,,: N Sl srnig Email: jlpoth@JonesDay.com ' e Arales

Kerry C. Fowler (State Bar No. 228982) MR 05 2018

JONES DAY Sherri B Carier. Exacut L 555 South Flower, 50th Floor ByWGgCl@m Los Angeles, CA 90071 " Raul Sanchez TRuly Telephone: +1.213.243.2792

Facsimile: +1.213.243.2539

Email: kcfowler@JonesDay.com

Attorneys for Plaintiff

CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, CENTRAL DISTRICT

CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER, a CASE NO. BC645494 California non-profit corporation, Plaintiff,

THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

V. FOR:

HEALTHCARE PARTNERS AFFILIATES 1) BREACH OF CONTRACT;

MEDICAL GROUP, a California professional 2) QUANTUM MERUIT; AND

medical corporation, d/b/a HEALTHCARE 3) OPEN ACCOUNT

PARTNERS MEDICAL GROUP; and

HEALTHCARE PARTNERS ASSOCIATES

MEDICAL GROUP, INC., a California

corporation, d/b/a HEALTHCARE Trial Date: None Set

PARTNERS MEDICAL GROUP, Discovery Cutoff: None Set Motion Cutoff: None Set

Defendants.