This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2021 at 19:01:34 (UTC).

CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT BENEFIT CORPORATION VS HEALTHCARE PARTNERS AFFILIATES MEDICAL GROUP, A CALIFORNIA PROFESSIONAL MEDICAL CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/16/2021 CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT BENEFIT CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HEALTHCARE PARTNERS AFFILIATES MEDICAL GROUP, A CALIFORNIA PROFESSIONAL MEDICAL CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0119

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT BENEFIT CORPORATION

Defendants

DAVITA MEDICAL GROUP AS SOCIA TES CALIFORNIA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION FKA HEALTHCARE PARTNERS ASSOCIATES MEDICAL GROUP INC.

HEALTHCARE PARTNERS AFFILIATES MEDICAL GROUP A CALIFORNIA PROFESSIONAL MEDICAL CORPORATION DBA HEALTHCARE PARTNERS MEDICAL GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAPIDUS RYAN D.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

8/18/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JIM D. BAUCH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE

8/18/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JIM D. BAUCH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE

Proof of Personal Service

8/18/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/16/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER, a California nonprofit benefit corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER, a California nonprofit benefit corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (OF JIM D. BAUCH In Support of Plaintiff's Peremptory Challenge); Filed by CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER, a California nonprofit benefit corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER, a California nonprofit benefit corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER, a California nonprofit benefit corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER, a California nonprofit benefit corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER, a California nonprofit benefit corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HEALTHCARE PARTNERS AFFILIATES is a litigant

Latest cases where HEALTHCARE PARTNERS MEDICAL GROUP A COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAPIDUS RYAN D.