Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/14/2020 at 12:03:11 (UTC).

CEDARS ASSISTED LIVING INC. VS ROBERT MITCHELL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/08/2019 CEDARS ASSISTED LIVING INC filed an Other lawsuit against ROBERT MITCHELL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HUEY P. COTTON. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1449

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HUEY P. COTTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CEDARS ASSISTED LIVING INC.

Defendants

MITCHELL DAISY

MITCHELL ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MELLER ERIC

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/5/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 02/05/2020

2/5/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 02/05/2020

Request for Dismissal

2/10/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/6/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

11/6/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/6/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/6/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

11/6/2019: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Request for Dismissal

11/6/2019: Request for Dismissal

Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale

11/7/2019: Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale

Writ of - WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY

11/8/2019: Writ of - WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (DAISY MITCHELL)

10/10/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (DAISY MITCHELL)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ROBERT MITCHELL)

10/10/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ROBERT MITCHELL)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

10/10/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/8/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/8/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/8/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/9/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Cedars Assisted Living Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Huey P. Cotton, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 02/05/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketWrit of (Possession of Real Property); Filed by Cedars Assisted Living Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale; Filed by Cedars Assisted Living Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Cedars Assisted Living Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketJudgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by Cedars Assisted Living Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Cedars Assisted Living Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Cedars Assisted Living Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Cedars Assisted Living Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Cedars Assisted Living Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ROBERT MITCHELL)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((DAISY MITCHELL)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Cedars Assisted Living Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Cedars Assisted Living Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cedars Assisted Living Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CEDARS ASSISTED LIVING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meller, Eric