Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/03/2019 at 08:50:53 (UTC).

CEDARS ASSISTED LIVING, INC. VS JOSE YARRA MATA

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 CEDARS ASSISTED LIVING, INC filed an Other lawsuit against JOSE YARRA MATA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1472

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CEDARS ASSISTED LIVING INC.

Defendant

MATA JOSE YARRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MELLER ERIC

Defendant Attorney

DALEY CHRISTA ANNE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/28/2019: Request for Dismissal

Demand for Jury Trial

10/24/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

10/24/2019: Answer

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/15/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/15/2019: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/15/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/15/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/16/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (JOSE YARRA MATA)

10/17/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (JOSE YARRA MATA)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

10/17/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by CEDARS ASSISTED LIVING, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by JOSE YARRA MATA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by JOSE YARRA MATA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((JOSE YARRA MATA)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CEDARS ASSISTED LIVING, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CEDARS ASSISTED LIVING, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CEDARS ASSISTED LIVING, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CEDARS ASSISTED LIVING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DALEY CHRISTA ANNE