This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/27/2019 at 05:00:37 (UTC).

CEDAR BUSINESS SERVICES LLC VS BONES IJEOMA ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/02/2018 a Contract - Debt Collection case was filed by CEDAR BUSINESS SERVICES LLC against BONES IJEOMA in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0185

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

CEDAR FINANCIAL

CEDAR BUSINESS SERVICES LLC

Defendants and Respondents

IJEOMA BONES

BYT TECHNOLOGY GROUP LLC

DOES 1 TO 10

 

Court Documents

Order - ORDER RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT

6/28/2019: Order - ORDER RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Judgment - JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT - BEFORE TRIAL - 06/28/2019 ENTERED FOR PLAINTIFF CEDAR BUSINESS SERVICES, LLC DBA CEDAR FINANCIAL AGAINST DEFENDANT BONES IJEOMA.

6/28/2019: Judgment - JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT - BEFORE TRIAL - 06/28/2019 ENTERED FOR PLAINTIFF CEDAR BUSINESS SERVICES, LLC DBA CEDAR FINANCIAL AGAINST DEFENDANT BONES IJEOMA.

Order - ORDER RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT

5/30/2019: Order - ORDER RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKAGE)

5/30/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKAGE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKAGE) OF 05/30/2019

5/30/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKAGE) OF 05/30/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKAGE)

4/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKAGE)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/28/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/21/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

7/26/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/10/2018: AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

8/14/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

8/24/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

Minute Order -

8/27/2018: Minute Order -

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

7/23/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail -

7/3/2018: Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

7/3/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/6/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/4/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Status Conference (re default judgment package) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference re default judgment package)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketJudgment (- Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 06/28/2019 entered for Plaintiff Cedar Business Services, LLC DBA Cedar Financial against Defendant Bones Ijeoma.); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketOrder (re default judgment)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketDeclaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees; Filed by Cedar Business Services, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Status Conference (re default judgment package) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketOrder (re default judgment)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Status Conference re default judgment package) of 05/30/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference re default judgment package)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Status Conference (re entry of default/default judgment package) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Cedar Business Services, LLC (Plaintiff); Cedar Financial (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketFIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1) BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT 2) COMMON COUNTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Cedar Business Services, LLC (Plaintiff); Cedar Financial (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cedar Business Services, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC700185    Hearing Date: November 07, 2019    Dept: 50

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 50

hartford accident & indemnity company,

Plaintiff,

vs.

ivan morales, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.:

BC 700185

Hearing Date:

November 7, 2019

Hearing Time:

8:30 a.m.

ORDER RE:

PLAINTIFF’S REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Plaintiff Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company (“Plaintiff”) seeks entry of default judgment against defendant Ivan Morales in the total amount of $57,181.00, comprising $56,649.75 demanded in the complaint and $531.25 in costs.

The Court finds that Plaintiff has sufficiently supported its request by the submitted declarations and evidence. Therefore, Plaintiff’s request is granted. The Court has signed the judgment. No appearance is necessary.

DATED: November 6, 2019 ________________________________

Hon. Teresa A. Beaudet

Judge, Los Angeles Superior Court