This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/08/2021 at 12:57:08 (UTC).

CECILIA ZELAYA, ET AL. VS ARTHUR PEREZ

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 CECILIA ZELAYA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ARTHUR PEREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3746

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALVARENGA ANALICIA

ZELAYA CECILIA

Defendant

PEREZ ARTHUR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLDSTEIN HOWARD

Defendant Attorney

BAHARVAR GABRIELLA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/12/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

4/28/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

4/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Proof of Personal Service

4/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

6/14/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/14/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

6/14/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2024
  • Hearing04/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • Hearing10/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • Hearing09/26/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Arthur Perez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Arthur Perez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Arthur Perez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Cecilia Zelaya (Plaintiff); Analicia Alvarenga (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Cecilia Zelaya (Plaintiff); Analicia Alvarenga (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Cecilia Zelaya (Plaintiff); Analicia Alvarenga (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cecilia Zelaya (Plaintiff); Analicia Alvarenga (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAHARVAR GABRIELLA