Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/13/2021 at 14:43:11 (UTC).

CECILIA M. RUIZ BY AND THROUGH HER SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST, GEORGIA CUEVAS, ET AL. VS METHODIST HOSPITAL OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 CECILIA M RUIZ BY AND THROUGH HER SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST, GEORGIA CUEVAS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against METHODIST HOSPITAL OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM F. FAHEY and MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5914

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CUEVAS INDIVIDUALLY GEORGIA

RUIZ BY AND THROUGH HER SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST GEORGIA CUEVAS CECILIA M.

Defendant

METHODIST HOSPITAL OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PECK SPENCER ELIOT

Defendant Attorney

DIK DANIEL KURT

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DANIEL K. DIK IN COMPLIANCE WITH CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 430.41 AND 435.5 IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE AS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/18/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DANIEL K. DIK IN COMPLIANCE WITH CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 430.41 AND 435.5 IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE AS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

6/18/2021: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Case Management Statement

6/8/2021: Case Management Statement

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

6/18/2021: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/29/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

4/29/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT METHODIST HOSPITAL OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAS DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

5/6/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT METHODIST HOSPITAL OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAS DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

5/12/2021: Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

Notice of Ruling

5/19/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) /BY ...)

5/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) /BY ...)

Request for Judicial Notice

3/12/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

3/12/2021: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

3/12/2021: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/24/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

2/17/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES CECILIA M. RUIZ

2/17/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES CECILIA M. RUIZ

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2021
  • Hearing09/22/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • Hearing09/22/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (OF DANIEL K. DIK IN COMPLIANCE WITH CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 430.41 AND 435.5 IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE AS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT); Filed by METHODIST HOSPITAL OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by METHODIST HOSPITAL OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by METHODIST HOSPITAL OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketMotion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by METHODIST HOSPITAL OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by CECILIA M. RUIZ by and through her Successor-in-Interest, Georgia Cuevas (Plaintiff); GEORGIA CUEVAS, Individually, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by METHODIST HOSPITAL OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by CECILIA M. RUIZ by and through her Successor-in-Interest, Georgia Cuevas (Plaintiff); GEORGIA CUEVAS, Individually, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:58 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Plaintiff's Peremptory Challenge filed against...) of 02/18/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Plaintiff's Peremptory Challenge filed against...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees (CECILIA M. RUIZ); Filed by CECILIA M. RUIZ by and through her Successor-in-Interest, Georgia Cuevas (Plaintiff); GEORGIA CUEVAS, Individually, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by CECILIA M. RUIZ by and through her Successor-in-Interest, Georgia Cuevas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CECILIA M. RUIZ by and through her Successor-in-Interest, Georgia Cuevas (Plaintiff); GEORGIA CUEVAS, Individually, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CECILIA M. RUIZ by and through her Successor-in-Interest, Georgia Cuevas (Plaintiff); GEORGIA CUEVAS, Individually, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CECILIA M. RUIZ by and through her Successor-in-Interest, Georgia Cuevas (Plaintiff); GEORGIA CUEVAS, Individually, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where METHODIST HOSPITAL OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PECK SPENCER ELIOT