This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/03/2022 at 13:54:24 (UTC).

CECILIA GOMEZ VS LOREN QUEZADA

Case Summary

On 09/12/2022 CECILIA GOMEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LOREN QUEZADA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9533

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOMEZ CECILIA

Defendant

QUEZADA LOREN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEUTHE ERIC B

Defendant Attorney

LEACH BRIAN E

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/12/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/12/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

9/12/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

9/12/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/12/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/12/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/12/2022: Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/24/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

10/24/2022: Answer

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

11/22/2022: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2024
  • Hearing09/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2024
  • Hearing03/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2024
  • Hearing02/26/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • Hearing02/10/2023 at 3:00 PM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference (IDC) scheduled for 02/10/2023 at 03:00 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts; Filed by: Loren Quezada (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Loren Quezada (Defendant); As to: Cecilia Gomez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Loren Quezada (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Cecilia Gomez (Plaintiff); As to: Loren Quezada (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 09/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jill Feeney in Department 30 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Cecilia Gomez (Plaintiff); As to: Loren Quezada (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Cecilia Gomez (Plaintiff); As to: Loren Quezada (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/26/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEACH BRIAN E