This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/23/2020 at 18:16:21 (UTC).

CECILIA BAUMGARTEN VS STRIVECTIN OPERATING COMPANY, INC A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/13/2019 CECILIA BAUMGARTEN filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against STRIVECTIN OPERATING COMPANY, INC A DELAWARE CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MELVIN D. SANDVIG. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0912

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MELVIN D. SANDVIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAUMGARTEN CECILIA

Defendants

STRIVECTIN OPERATING COMPANY INC A DELAWARE CORPORATION

STRIVECTIN HOLDINGS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALEXIS ANDREW LAURENCE

Defendant Attorney

IRIZARRY DAWN M.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/13/2019: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/13/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/13/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/13/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/13/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/27/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Personal Service

11/27/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/27/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - DEFENDANTS NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY AND STATE COURT OF REMOVAL OF ACTION

12/17/2019: Notice - DEFENDANTS NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY AND STATE COURT OF REMOVAL OF ACTION

Answer

12/13/2019: Answer

Request for Dismissal

3/24/2020: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Cecilia Baumgarten (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketDEFENDANTS? NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY AND STATE COURT OF REMOVAL OF ACTION; Filed by Strivectin Operating Company, Inc a Delaware corporation (Defendant); Strivectin Holdings, LLC a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Strivectin Operating Company, Inc a Delaware corporation (Defendant); Strivectin Holdings, LLC a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Cecilia Baumgarten (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Cecilia Baumgarten (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Cecilia Baumgarten (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Cecilia Baumgarten (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Cecilia Baumgarten (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cecilia Baumgarten (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Strivectin Operating Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer IRIZARRY DAWN MICHELLE