This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/20/2020 at 05:16:59 (UTC).

CECILE ORBON VS THE ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, , ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/31/2019 CECILE ORBON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8891

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORBON CECILE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

THE ALBERTSONS COMPANIES

ALBERTSONS LLC

THE VONS COMPANIES

TOWNSHIP BUILDING SERVICES INC.

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

TOWNSHIP BUILDING SERVICES INC.

MOES 1-20 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YADEGARI MICHAEL MORDECHAI

Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

LEWIS AMY

ROSVALL ROBERT LAWRENCE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CROSS-COMPLAINANT TOWNSHIP BUILDING SERVICES, INC.

10/13/2020: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CROSS-COMPLAINANT TOWNSHIP BUILDING SERVICES, INC.

Request for Dismissal

10/13/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARINGS DUE TO EMERGENCY ORDERS RE:...)

9/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARINGS DUE TO EMERGENCY ORDERS RE:...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARINGS DUE TO EMERGENCY ORDERS RE:...) OF 09/09/2020

9/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARINGS DUE TO EMERGENCY ORDERS RE:...) OF 09/09/2020

Request for Dismissal

9/30/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE DUE TO HOLIDAY CONGE...)

6/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE DUE TO HOLIDAY CONGE...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE DUE TO HOLIDAY CONGE...) OF 06/02/2020

6/2/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE DUE TO HOLIDAY CONGE...) OF 06/02/2020

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

1/30/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Cross-Complaint

8/22/2019: Cross-Complaint

Answer

8/21/2019: Answer

Proof of Service by Mail

7/31/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/1/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

7/1/2019: Answer

Cross-Complaint

7/1/2019: Cross-Complaint

PI General Order

6/7/2019: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/7/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/31/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/31/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (of Cross-Complainant Township Building Services, Inc.); Filed by Township Building Services, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Albertsons Companies, Inc. Erroneously Sued As THE ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by CECILE ORBON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • Docketat 11:02 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Rescheduling Hearings due to Emergency Orders Re:...) of 09/09/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Rescheduling Hearings due to Emergency Orders Re:...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • Docketat 3:04 PM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Continuance of Trial Date due to Holiday Conge...) of 06/02/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Continuance of Trial Date due to Holiday Conge...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Robert Lawrence Rosvall (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Albertsons Companies, Inc. Erroneously Sued As THE ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, (Defendant); Township Building Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Albertsons Companies, Inc. Erroneously Sued As THE ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Albertsons Companies, Inc. Erroneously Sued As THE ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CECILE ORBON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CECILE ORBON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CECILE ORBON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CECILE ORBON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE VONS COMPANIES INC DBA PAVILIONS is a litigant

Latest cases where TOWNSHIP BUILDING SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Albertsons Companies, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSVALL ROBERT LAWRENCE