Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/18/2021 at 14:12:26 (UTC).

CEBALLOS, NESTOR HUGO VS BARRERA, ANA RUTH GONZALEZ

Case Summary

On 04/29/2020 CEBALLOS, NESTOR HUGO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BARRERA, ANA RUTH GONZALEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3837

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CEBALLOS NESTOR HUGO

Respondent

BARRERA ANA RUTH GONZALEZ

 

Court Documents

Judgment Package Received - FC2336 - REVIEW 426

10/27/2020: Judgment Package Received - FC2336 - REVIEW 426

Judgment

1/22/2021: Judgment

Notice - Entry of Judgment

1/22/2021: Notice - Entry of Judgment

Request - Enter Default FL165

8/11/2020: Request - Enter Default FL165

Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure

8/11/2020: Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure

Declaration - Default FL170

8/11/2020: Declaration - Default FL170

Proof of Service of Summons - Petition - FL100;

6/26/2020: Proof of Service of Summons - Petition - FL100;

Summons

4/29/2020: Summons

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

4/29/2020: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

4/29/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

4/29/2020: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Notice - Case Assignment

4/30/2020: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

4/30/2020: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketJudgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - FC2336 (Rejected ((Judgment filed and entered 01/22/2021 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - FC2336 (REVIEW 426 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (Petition - FL100; ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less