This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/21/2021 at 12:57:01 (UTC).

CAVALRY BAPTIST CHURCH OF GARDENA, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION VS LIMAI EDUCATION INC, A CALFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 06/22/2021 CAVALRY BAPTIST CHURCH OF GARDENA, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against LIMAI EDUCATION INC, A CALFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0453

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY BAPTIST CHURCH OF GARDENA A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION

Defendant

LIMAI EDUCATION INC A CALFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAMOUREUX TIMOTHY GEORGE

Defendant Attorney

ENDLER JEFFREY BRAD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • Hearing11/10/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • Hearing11/03/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • Docketat 2:22 PM in Department B; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/24/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Jury Trial - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department B; Jury Trial - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Limai Education Inc, a Calfornia Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Order to Show Cause Re: (Failure To Proceed With Unlawful Detainer) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer Trial; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Limai Education Inc, a Calfornia Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Limai Education Inc, a Calfornia Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Limai Education Inc, a Calfornia Corporation)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cavalry Baptist Church of Gardena, a California nonprofit Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint; Filed by Cavalry Baptist Church of Gardena, a California nonprofit Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Cavalry Baptist Church of Gardena, a California nonprofit Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Cavalry Baptist Church of Gardena, a California nonprofit Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ENDLER JEFFREY B. ESQ.