This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/15/2022 at 05:17:36 (UTC).

C'AUTRY HATCHER JR VS JAMES DOBNEY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/11/2022 C'AUTRY HATCHER JR filed an Other lawsuit against JAMES DOBNEY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0516

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HATCHER JR C'AUTRY

Defendants

DOBNEY JAMES

MARZPANYAN EDGAR

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/11/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - NOTICE OF ONLINE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ODR) UNLAWFUL DETAINER (UD)

4/11/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF ONLINE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ODR) UNLAWFUL DETAINER (UD)

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/11/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

4/14/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

4/12/2022: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (EDGAR MARZPANYAN)

4/12/2022: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (EDGAR MARZPANYAN)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (JAMES DOBNEY)

4/12/2022: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (JAMES DOBNEY)

Unknown - PLAINTIFFS MANDATORY COVER SHEET AND SUPPLEMENTAL ALLEGATIONS UNLAWFUL DETAINER

4/11/2022: Unknown - PLAINTIFFS MANDATORY COVER SHEET AND SUPPLEMENTAL ALLEGATIONS UNLAWFUL DETAINER

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/11/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/11/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

4/11/2022: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

08/09/2022

Hearing08/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2022

Hearing04/19/2022 at 10:30 AM in Department M at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Fee Waiver Hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2022

DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2022

DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2022

DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Edgar Marzpanyan)); Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2022

DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((James Dobney)); Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2022

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2022

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2022

DocketPlaintiff?s Mandatory Cover Sheet and Supplemental Allegations ? Unlawful Detainer; Filed by C'Autry Hatcher Jr (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2022

DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2022

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by C'Autry Hatcher Jr (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2022

DocketComplaint; Filed by C'Autry Hatcher Jr (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2022

DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Unlawful Detainer (UD); Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less