This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/06/2022 at 03:22:39 (UTC).

CATTRAC CONSTRUCTION INC. VS SWINERTON BUILDERS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/19/2022 CATTRAC CONSTRUCTION INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SWINERTON BUILDERS,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3993

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CATTRAC CONSTRUCTION INC.

Defendants

FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

SWINERTON BUILDERS

ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JENSEN CHRISTOPHER G.

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/19/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

10/19/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/19/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/19/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/19/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/19/2022: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

10/19/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

10/19/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/21/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - NOTICE OF PROCEEDING

10/25/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF PROCEEDING

Request for Dismissal

11/3/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Cattrac Construction Inc. on 10/19/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Cattrac Construction Inc. as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/04/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Cattrac Construction Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Proceeding; Filed by: Cattrac Construction Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Swinerton Builders (Defendant); Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant); Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maurice A. Leiter in Department 54 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketAddress for Christopher G. Jensen (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Cattrac Construction Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Swinerton Builders (Defendant); Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant); Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Cattrac Construction Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Swinerton Builders (Defendant); Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant); Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Cattrac Construction Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Swinerton Builders (Defendant); Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant); Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Cattrac Construction Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Swinerton Builders (Defendant); Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant); Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SWINERTON BUILDERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Zurich American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND is a litigant

Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant