This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/14/2021 at 10:41:38 (UTC).

CATHY JEAN MOYER, AN INDIVIDUAL VS MARIO JAVIER MACIAS, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 07/30/2021 CATHY JEAN MOYER, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARIO JAVIER MACIAS, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0607

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOYER AN INDIVIDUAL CATHY JEAN

Defendant

MACIAS AN INDIVIDUAL MARIO JAVIER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROMERO VANESSA

Defendant Attorney

DWYER ROBERT J.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/30/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/2/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

9/28/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/28/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

9/28/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Request for Dismissal

11/23/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by CATHY JEAN MOYER, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by MARIO JAVIER MACIAS, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by MARIO JAVIER MACIAS, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by MARIO JAVIER MACIAS, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by CATHY JEAN MOYER, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CATHY JEAN MOYER, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CATHY JEAN MOYER, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CATHY JEAN MOYER, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROMERO VANESSA