Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/23/2021 at 11:30:10 (UTC).

CATHY HERNANDEZ VS DEANCO HEALTHCARE, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 CATHY HERNANDEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against DEANCO HEALTHCARE, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1741

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDEZ CATHY

Defendant

DEANCO HEALTHCARE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LIN YI-HSUAN RACHEL

CLARK TYLER FRANCIS

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/27/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

1/27/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/21/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/14/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/14/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • Hearing06/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Cathy Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Cathy Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Cathy Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cathy Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Cathy Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEANCO HEALTHCARE LLC A CALIFORNIA... is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIN YI-HSUAN RACHEL