This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/25/2021 at 15:30:30 (UTC).

CATHY CHOE VS BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 CATHY CHOE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3221

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHOE CATHY

Defendant

BMW OF NORTH AMERICA LLC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEE DAVID D. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/24/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/24/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/23/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/23/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

11/23/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2022
  • Hearing03/01/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • Hearing02/01/2022 at 09:45 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Cathy Choe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cathy Choe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Cathy Choe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEE DAVID D.