This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/26/2023 at 15:30:44 (UTC).

CATHERINE THOMAS VS DORDULIAN LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/30/2022 CATHERINE THOMAS filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against DORDULIAN LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1980

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THOMAS CATHERINE

Defendants

DESANTIS DANIEL

DORDULIAN LAW GROUP A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

ROJAS REBECCA

WILSHIRE LAW FIRM PLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

MILLER DANIEL B.

IMADA MARK MASAO

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

3/13/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...) OF 03/13/2023

3/13/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...) OF 03/13/2023

Case Management Statement

2/14/2023: Case Management Statement

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

1/6/2023: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

1/6/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Request for Judicial Notice

1/6/2023: Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Judicial Notice

12/29/2022: Request for Judicial Notice

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

12/29/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

12/29/2022: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

12/29/2022: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARK M. IMADA IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

12/29/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARK M. IMADA IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/29/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

12/27/2022: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/5/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

11/30/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 11/30/2022

11/30/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 11/30/2022

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/28/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/30/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2023
  • Hearing12/18/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2023
  • Hearing12/14/2023 at 10:30 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Demurrer - without Motion to Strike: Filed By: Dordulian Law Group, A Professional Corporation (Defendant); Result: Overruled ; Result Date: 03/13/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Demurrer - without Motion to Strike: Filed By: Wilshire Law Firm, PLC (Defendant),Daniel DeSantis (Defendant),Rebecca Rojas (Defendant); Result: Overruled ; Result Date: 03/13/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 12/18/2023 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 12/14/2023 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...) of 03/13/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 03/13/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 updated: Result Date to 03/13/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 03/13/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 updated: Result Date to 03/13/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketDue to Clerical Error, Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/30/2022 at 11:15 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 Not Held - Clerical Error was rescheduled to 12/29/2022 11:15 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/30/2022 at 11:15 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Catherine Thomas (Plaintiff); As to: Dordulian Law Group, A Professional Corporation (Defendant); Wilshire Law Firm, PLC (Defendant); Daniel DeSantis (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Catherine Thomas (Plaintiff); As to: Dordulian Law Group, A Professional Corporation (Defendant); Wilshire Law Firm, PLC (Defendant); Daniel DeSantis (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Catherine Thomas (Plaintiff); As to: Dordulian Law Group, A Professional Corporation (Defendant); Wilshire Law Firm, PLC (Defendant); Daniel DeSantis (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael L. Stern in Department 62 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less