This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/17/2021 at 21:28:38 (UTC).

CATHERINE MONROE, ET AL. VS MEREDITH BAER HOME, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 CATHERINE MONROE filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against MEREDITH BAER HOME. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CAROLYN B. KUHL. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9593

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CAROLYN B. KUHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MONROE CATHERINE

SEGURA LORENA

Defendants

MEREDITH BAER HOME

BAER MERIDITH J.

MERIBEAR PRODUCTIONS INC.

MERIDITH BAER & ASSOCIATES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPIVAK DAVID G.

Defendant Attorney

KAUFMAN THOMAS R.

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION OF LLUVIA ISLAS OF ILYM GROUP, INC., REGARDING DISBURSEMENT OF SETTLEMENT FUNDS

10/22/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF LLUVIA ISLAS OF ILYM GROUP, INC., REGARDING DISBURSEMENT OF SETTLEMENT FUNDS

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STATEMENT ACCOMPANYI...)]

3/30/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STATEMENT ACCOMPANYI...)]

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STATEMENT ACCOMPANYI...)

3/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STATEMENT ACCOMPANYI...)

Judgment - JUDGMENT AND ORDER APPROVING PAGA SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

2/23/2021: Judgment - JUDGMENT AND ORDER APPROVING PAGA SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

Notice of Entry of Judgment

3/2/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment - OR ORDER

1/19/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment - OR ORDER

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS CATHERINE MONROE AND LORENA SEGURA'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT- MONROE

1/28/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS CATHERINE MONROE AND LORENA SEGURA'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT- MONROE

Motion re: - NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS CATHERINE MONROE AND LORENA SEGURA'S MOTION AND MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT

1/28/2021: Motion re: - NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS CATHERINE MONROE AND LORENA SEGURA'S MOTION AND MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DAVID SPIVAK IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS CATHERINE MONROE AND LORENA SEGURA'S UNOPPOSED MOTION

1/28/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DAVID SPIVAK IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS CATHERINE MONROE AND LORENA SEGURA'S UNOPPOSED MOTION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DARIN MARGULES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS CATHERINE MONROE AND LORENA SEGURA'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT

1/28/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DARIN MARGULES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS CATHERINE MONROE AND LORENA SEGURA'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER PAGA SETTLEMENT)

2/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER PAGA SETTLEMENT)

Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)

11/25/2020: Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISMISS CLASS ALLEGATIONS AND FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/1/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISMISS CLASS ALLEGATIONS AND FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO (1) CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT AND (2) CONTINUE PLAINTIFF'S DEADLINE TO FILE THE MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT

7/30/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO (1) CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT AND (2) CONTINUE PLAINTIFF'S DEADLINE TO FILE THE MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT

Notice of Entry of Judgment

8/11/2020: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE)

5/8/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO VACATE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND LIFT STAY

3/11/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO VACATE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND LIFT STAY

Notice of Entry of Judgment

1/6/2020: Notice of Entry of Judgment

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2021
  • Docketat 4:30 PM in Department 12, Carolyn B. Kuhl, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (ReFiling of the Final Report of the Admistrator) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Lluvia Islas of ILYM Group, Inc., Regarding Disbursement of Settlement Funds); Filed by Catherine Monroe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • Docketat 10:04 AM in Department 12, Carolyn B. Kuhl, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • Docketat 4:30 PM in Department 12, Carolyn B. Kuhl, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (reFiling of the Proposed Letter to Check Recipients) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Court Order re: Stipulation and Order to Statement Accompanyi...)]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Stipulation and Order to Statement Accompanyi...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by Catherine Monroe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 12, Carolyn B. Kuhl, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (PAGA settlement) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketJudgment (and order approving PAGA settlement agreement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Catherine Monroe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Catherine Monroe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Catherine Monroe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • Docketat 3:33 PM in Department 12, Carolyn B. Kuhl, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION) of 08/28/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Catherine Monroe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Catherine Monroe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERIDITH BAER & ASSOCIATES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MEREDITH BAER HOME is a litigant

Latest cases where MERIBEAR PRODUCTIONS INC. DBA MERIDITH BAER HOME is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SPIVAK DAVID G.