This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/13/2023 at 08:49:52 (UTC).

CATHERINE HUANG VS PETER HO WIN, M.D., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/30/2022 CATHERINE HUANG filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PETER HO WIN, M D ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0907

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HUANG CATHERINE

Defendants

WIN M.D. PETER HO

PETER HO WIN M.D. INC. A CALIFORNIA PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RYU FRANCIS SEONGJIN

Defendant Attorney

YEE STEVEN R

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTERY OF ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS PETER HO WIN, M.D. AND PETER HO WIN, M.D., INC. LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

9/26/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTERY OF ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS PETER HO WIN, M.D. AND PETER HO WIN, M.D., INC. LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR ...)

9/15/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR ...)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION FOR ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS PETER HO WIN, M.D. AND PETER HO WIN, M.D., INC.'S LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; [PROPOS

9/15/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION FOR ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS PETER HO WIN, M.D. AND PETER HO WIN, M.D., INC.'S LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; [PROPOS

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR ...) OF 09/15/2022

9/15/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR ...) OF 09/15/2022

Answer

9/14/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/1/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Ruling

9/1/2022: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/31/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Substitution of Attorney

8/30/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

8/30/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Case Management Statement

8/29/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/12/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/11/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

6/13/2022: Answer

Case Management Statement

7/26/2022: Case Management Statement

Answer

6/13/2022: Answer

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

5/19/2022: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2023
  • Hearing08/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 73 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2023
  • Hearing07/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 73 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketNotice OF ENTERY OF ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS PETER HO WIN, M.D. AND PETER HO WIN, M.D., INC. LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; Filed by: Peter Ho Win, M.D. (Defendant); Peter Ho Win, M.D., Inc., a California Professional Corporation (Defendant); As to: Catherine Huang (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order STIPULATION FOR ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS PETER HO WIN, M.D. AND PETER HO WIN, M.D., INC.'S LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON; Signed and Filed by: Peter Ho Win, M.D. (Defendant); Peter Ho Win, M.D., Inc., a California Professional Corporation (Defendant); As to: Catherine Huang (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order STIPULATION FOR ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS PETER HO WIN, M.D. AND PETER HO WIN, M.D., INC.'S LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON: Filed By: Peter Ho Win, M.D. (Defendant),Peter Ho Win, M.D., Inc., a California Professional Corporation (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 09/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Entry of Order on Stipulation for ...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Entry of Order on Stipulation for ...) of 09/15/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Peter Ho Win, M.D. (Defendant); Peter Ho Win, M.D., Inc., a California Professional Corporation (Defendant); As to: Catherine Huang (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Peter Ho Win, M.D. (Defendant); Peter Ho Win, M.D., Inc., a California Professional Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Peter Ho Win, M.D. (Defendant); Peter Ho Win, M.D., Inc., a California Professional Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketAddress for Francis Seongjin Ryu (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 73

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Catherine Huang (Plaintiff); As to: Peter Ho Win, M.D. (Defendant); Peter Ho Win, M.D., Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Catherine Huang (Plaintiff); As to: Peter Ho Win, M.D. (Defendant); Peter Ho Win, M.D., Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Timothy Patrick Dillon in Department 73 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer YEE STEVEN R. ESQ.