This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/01/2021 at 12:00:17 (UTC).

CATHERINE GWYNN VS GEVORK GEORGE AFIFI, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/19/2021 CATHERINE GWYNN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GEVORK GEORGE AFIFI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8938

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GWYNN CATHERINE

Defendants

AFIFI GEVORK GEORGE

ZOGRABIAN ERIK

AFIFI GOHAR

AFIFI-ZOGRABIAN ISABEL

ZOGRABIAN FAMILY TRUST

SARDARBEGIANS GEVIK

SARDARBEGIANS JACLYN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TOPCHYAN ARUTYUN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2024
  • Hearing05/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • Hearing11/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • Hearing11/02/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Catherine Gwynn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Catherine Gwynn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Catherine Gwynn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TOPCHYAN ARUTYUN