This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/29/2021 at 20:12:31 (UTC).

CATHERINE CUNNINGHAM VS JVCKENWOOD USA CORP., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 CATHERINE CUNNINGHAM filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against JVCKENWOOD USA CORP . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5688

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CUNNINGHAM CATHERINE

Defendants

TSIAGE YESHI

JVCKENWOOD USA CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRANCK LEE

Defendant Attorney

MEQUET SHARON S.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

6/1/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/7/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

6/7/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Personal Service

3/3/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

3/22/2021: Answer

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/16/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/16/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2023
  • Hearing05/17/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • Hearing05/10/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • Hearing11/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 49; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Catherine Cunningham (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Catherine Cunningham (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by JVCKENWOOD USA Corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by JVCKENWOOD USA Corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Catherine Cunningham (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Catherine Cunningham (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Catherine Cunningham (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Catherine Cunningham (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JVCKENWOOD USA CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEQUET SHARON S.