This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/26/2022 at 05:32:59 (UTC).

CATHERINE CATES, ET AL. VS PAUL ROUGHLEY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/11/2022 CATHERINE CATES, filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PAUL ROUGHLEY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6016

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CATES CATHERINE

CATES SIDNEY

Cross Defendants and Defendants

MANCINI WILLIAM ANTHONY

ROUGHLEY PAUL

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

ROUGHLEY PAUL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRAYBROOKE SCOTT EVAN

PAIJUK VAROUJ GEORGE

Defendant Attorneys

SAFECHUCK BARBARA Z.

HSU STEPHEN

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/11/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/11/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

8/11/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

8/11/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/11/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/11/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/11/2022: Complaint

Association of Attorney

8/16/2022: Association of Attorney

Demand for Jury Trial

10/12/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

10/12/2022: Answer

Cross-Complaint

10/12/2022: Cross-Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/13/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

10/13/2022: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

10/18/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2024
  • Hearing08/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2024
  • Hearing02/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2024
  • Hearing01/25/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketSummons on Cross Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Paul Roughley (Cross-Complainant); As to: William Anthony Mancini (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: William Anthony Mancini (Defendant); As to: Catherine Cates (Plaintiff); Sidney Cates (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: William Anthony Mancini (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Paul Roughley (Defendant); As to: Catherine Cates (Plaintiff); Sidney Cates (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Paul Roughley (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: Paul Roughley (Defendant); As to: William Anthony Mancini (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by: Catherine Cates (Plaintiff); Sidney Cates (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Catherine Cates (Plaintiff); Sidney Cates (Plaintiff); As to: Paul Roughley (Defendant); William Anthony Mancini (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Catherine Cates (Plaintiff); Sidney Cates (Plaintiff); As to: Paul Roughley (Defendant); William Anthony Mancini (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 01/25/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SAFECHUCK BARBARA ZANE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HSU STEPHEN