This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/03/2022 at 02:47:27 (UTC).

CATHERINE ABBASI, ET AL. VS H. JOSEPH NAIM, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/24/2022 CATHERINE ABBASI, filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against H JOSEPH NAIM,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0437

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ABBASI CATHERINE

ABBASI ROBERT

Defendants

ADVANCE BARIATRIC CENTER MEDICAL CORPORATION

NAIM H. JOSEPH

SOUTH COAST SPECIALTY SURGERY CENTER INC.

ST. MARY MEDICAL CENTER FOUNDATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BECKER TODD BENJAMIN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/30/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

8/30/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/24/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/24/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

8/24/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/24/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

9/20/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/20/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/20/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/20/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal

10/26/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Catherine Abbasi, et al. on 08/24/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Catherine Abbasi and Robert Abbasi as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Catherine Abbasi (Plaintiff); Robert Abbasi (Plaintiff); As to: H. Joseph Naim (Defendant); Advance Bariatric Center, Medical Corporation (Defendant); South Coast Specialty Surgery Center, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: Filed By: Robert Abbasi (Plaintiff),Catherine Abbasi (Plaintiff); Result: Entered; Result Date: 10/26/2022; As To Parties changed from Catherine Abbasi (Plaintiff), Advance Bariatric Center, Medical Corporation (Defendant), South Coast Specialty Surgery Center, Inc. (Defendant), Robert Abbasi (Plaintiff), St. Mary Medical Center Foundation (Defendant), H. Joseph Naim (Defendant) to South Coast Specialty Surgery Center, Inc. (Defendant), Advance Bariatric Center, Medical Corporation (Defendant), H. Joseph Naim (Defendant), St. Mary Medical Center Foundation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 10/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Catherine Abbasi (Plaintiff); Robert Abbasi (Plaintiff); As to: H. Joseph Naim (Defendant); Service Date: 09/16/2022; Service Cost: 100.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Catherine Abbasi (Plaintiff); Robert Abbasi (Plaintiff); As to: Advance Bariatric Center, Medical Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 09/16/2022; Service Cost: 100.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Catherine Abbasi (Plaintiff); Robert Abbasi (Plaintiff); As to: St. Mary Medical Center Foundation (Defendant); Service Date: 09/16/2022; Service Cost: 70.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Catherine Abbasi (Plaintiff); Robert Abbasi (Plaintiff); As to: South Coast Specialty Surgery Center, Inc. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/19/2022; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael P. Vicencia in Department S26 Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Catherine Abbasi (Plaintiff); Robert Abbasi (Plaintiff); As to: H. Joseph Naim (Defendant); Advance Bariatric Center, Medical Corporation (Defendant); South Coast Specialty Surgery Center, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Catherine Abbasi (Plaintiff); Robert Abbasi (Plaintiff); As to: H. Joseph Naim (Defendant); Advance Bariatric Center, Medical Corporation (Defendant); South Coast Specialty Surgery Center, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Catherine Abbasi (Plaintiff); Robert Abbasi (Plaintiff); As to: H. Joseph Naim (Defendant); Advance Bariatric Center, Medical Corporation (Defendant); South Coast Specialty Surgery Center, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where South Coast Specialty Surgery Center is a litigant

Latest cases where ST. MARY MEDICAL CENTER FOUNDATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BECKER TODD BENJAMIN