This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/06/2022 at 13:34:22 (UTC).

CATHAY BANK VS SK DENTAL INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 CATHAY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SK DENTAL INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL S. MURPHY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0057

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL S. MURPHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CATHAY BANK

Defendants

LEE GRACE EUNHYE

SK DENTAL INC

Not Classified By Court

JUNG SUNG KUK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREENBAUM MARTIN

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON APPEARANCE AT THIRD PARTY EXAMINATION AND NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF EXAMINATION

10/4/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON APPEARANCE AT THIRD PARTY EXAMINATION AND NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF EXAMINATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION)

10/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION)

Minute Order - (AMENDED)

11/1/2021: Minute Order - (AMENDED)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON APPEARANCE AT THIRD PARTY EXAMINATION AND NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF EXAMINATION

11/4/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON APPEARANCE AT THIRD PARTY EXAMINATION AND NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF EXAMINATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION)

11/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION) OF 11/30/2021

11/30/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION) OF 11/30/2021

Proof of Service by Mail

9/16/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Personal Service

9/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/3/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/3/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

6/30/2021: Case Management Statement

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

7/9/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

7/9/2021: Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/9/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

7/12/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Default Judgment

7/12/2021: Default Judgment

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

7/16/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

7/20/2021: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 11/30/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF NON APPEARANCE AT THIRD PARTY EXAMINATION AND NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF EXAMINATION); Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF NON APPEARANCE AT THIRD PARTY EXAMINATION AND NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF EXAMINATION); Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CATHAY BANK A CALIFORNIA BANK AND LENDER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREENBAUM MARTIN