This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2021 at 05:02:46 (UTC).

CATHAY BANK VS SHINE MORE, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/21/2021 CATHAY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SHINE MORE, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3009

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CATHAY BANK

Defendants

CHA CHAEYONG

SHINE MORE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREENBAUM MARTIN

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/21/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/21/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/21/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/21/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/22/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2022
  • Hearing01/04/2022 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CATHAY BANK A CALIFORNIA BANK AND LENDER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREENBAUM MARTIN