This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/23/2021 at 20:14:49 (UTC).

CATHAY BANK VS K.H. BIO TRADING, INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/29/2021 CATHAY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against K H BIO TRADING, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5813

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CATHAY BANK

Defendants

K.H. BIO TRADING INC

KIM KI HWAN

K.H. BIO TRADING INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GREENBAUM MARTIN

GREENBAUM MARTIN B.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/29/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

12/7/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/2/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

10/25/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/25/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/15/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

12/20/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/17/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

12/17/2021: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • Hearing02/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 34 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Cathay Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Cathay Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Cathay Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Cathay Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Cathay Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Cathay Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Cathay Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cathay Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CATHAY BANK A CALIFORNIA BANK AND LENDER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREENBAUM MARTIN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREENBAUM MARTIN B.