This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/02/2021 at 10:39:27 (UTC).

CATHAY BANK VS JONG HA MIN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/13/2021 CATHAY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JONG HA MIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YOLANDA OROZCO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8054

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YOLANDA OROZCO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CATHAY BANK

Defendants

BIYAC INC

MIN JONG HA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREENBAUM MARTIN BEIN

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/24/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

9/24/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Personal Service

8/24/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/24/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/25/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement

8/25/2021: Case Management Statement

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/8/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/9/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/13/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/14/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2021
  • Hearing12/10/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketNotice ((by Plaintiff) OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (Date: 09/10/2021)); Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement (by Plaintiff); Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CATHAY BANK A CALIFORNIA BANK AND LENDER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREENBAUM MARTIN B.