This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/17/2021 at 08:44:34 (UTC).

CATHAY BANK VS CHAE K. LIM

Case Summary

On 04/26/2021 CATHAY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHAE K LIM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5561

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CATHAY BANK

Defendant

LIM CHAE K.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREENBAUM MARTIN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketOrder re: Plaintiff's Request for Default Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees; Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: 21STCV15561 Hearing Date: September 27, 2021 Dept: 50

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 50

cathay bank,

Plaintiff,

vs.

chae k. lim, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.:

21STCV15561

Hearing Date:

September 27, 2021

Hearing Time:

10:00 a.m.

ORDER RE:

PLAINTIFF’S REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Plaintiff Cathay Bank requests entry of default judgment against Defendant Chae K. Kim, in the total amount of $39,025.93, comprising $35,624.77 demanded in the Complaint, $1,508.10 in prejudgment interest, $502 in costs, and $1,391.06 in attorney fees.

The Court finds that Plaintiff’s request is sufficiently supported by the submitted declarations and evidence. Accordingly, the Court has entered judgment as requested. No appearance at the hearing is required.

DATED: September 27, 2021

________________________________

Hon. Teresa A. Beaudet

Judge, Los Angeles Superior Court

'
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CATHAY BANK A CALIFORNIA BANK AND LENDER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREENBAUM MARTIN