This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/16/2021 at 17:43:07 (UTC).

CATHAY BANK VS ASAHI HEALTHCARE PRODUCTS INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 CATHAY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ASAHI HEALTHCARE PRODUCTS INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MALCOLM MACKEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2798

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MALCOLM MACKEY

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

CATHAY BANK

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ASAHI HEALTHCARE PRODUCTS INC.

HUANG PHILIP AKA SHENG S. HUANG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GREENBAUM MARTIN B.

WITTLIN IRWIN

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

DERBARSEGHIAN ARN

ABDIZADEH AMIR ABBAS

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/5/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/5/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/7/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/21/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/21/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/21/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

6/4/2021: Answer

Cross-Complaint

6/4/2021: Cross-Complaint

Substitution of Attorney

7/13/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Case Management Statement

7/6/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/19/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 07/21/2021

7/21/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 07/21/2021

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • Hearing01/23/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 55 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • Hearing01/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 55 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 07/21/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by ASAHI HEALTHCARE PRODUCTS INC. (Defendant); PHILIP HUANG (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by ASAHI HEALTHCARE PRODUCTS INC. (Defendant); PHILIP HUANG (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by ASAHI HEALTHCARE PRODUCTS INC. (Defendant); PHILIP HUANG (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CATHAY BANK A CALIFORNIA BANK AND LENDER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREENBAUM MARTIN B.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WITTLIN IRWIN