This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/25/2022 at 23:45:17 (UTC).

CATHAY BANK VS AE RAN CHOI, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 CATHAY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AE RAN CHOI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YOLANDA OROZCO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3998

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YOLANDA OROZCO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CATHAY BANK

Defendants

CHOI AE RAN

TUYO TRADING INC AKA LUKE MEDICAL SUPPLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREENBAUM MARTIN B.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/16/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/15/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Case Management Statement

1/14/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2022
  • Hearing04/19/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions for failure to timely serve the defendants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • Hearing04/19/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement (by Plaintiff); Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CATHAY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CATHAY BANK A CALIFORNIA BANK AND LENDER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREENBAUM MARTIN B.