Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/30/2020 at 07:14:10 (UTC).

CATALINA DIAZ VEGA VS LA AMAPOLA, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/20/2019 CATALINA DIAZ VEGA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LA AMAPOLA, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5765

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VEGA CATALINA DIAZ

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

LA AMAPOLA INC.

CMG ENTERPRISES LLC

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 THROUGH 20 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BERKOVICH GARY

LEVINE MARC ERIC

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

MOSIER MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

7/20/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

7/29/2020: Request for Dismissal

Association of Attorney

4/20/2020: Association of Attorney

Cross-Complaint

2/25/2020: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

2/25/2020: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Answer

2/20/2020: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/20/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/20/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/20/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/20/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/20/2019: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Catalina Diaz Vega (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by CMG Enterprises, LLC (Cross-Complainant); La Amapola, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Catalina Diaz Vega (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by La Amapola, Inc. (Defendant); CMG Enterprises, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by La Amapola, Inc. (Defendant); CMG Enterprises, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by La Amapola, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by La Amapola, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Catalina Diaz Vega (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Catalina Diaz Vega (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Catalina Diaz Vega (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LA AMAPOLA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVINE MARC ERIC