This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/03/2019 at 01:44:29 (UTC).

CATALINA BARRIENTOS ET AL VS LA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 04/20/2018 a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury case was filed by CATALINA BARRIENTOS against LA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3407

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 25

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Guardian Ad Litem

GARCIA-LOPEZ RACHEL

Minor

BARRIENTOS CATALINA

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

8/2/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

8/2/2018: NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

9/19/2018: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Summons

10/10/2018: Summons

Proof of Personal Service

10/24/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/20/2018: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Answer

1/22/2019: Answer

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

5/25/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

7/9/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

7/9/2018: NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

4/20/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2019
  • Answer; Filed by Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Catalina Barrientos (Legacy Party); Rachel Garcia-Lopez (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Proof Of Service Of Summons; Filed by Catalina Barrientos (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • Summons (on Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • Catalina Barrientos a minor by and through guardian ad litem Rachel Garcia-Lopez; Filed by Rachel Garcia-Lopez (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC703407    Hearing Date: March 19, 2020    Dept: 27

ORDER RE CONTINUANCE

Due to governmental declarations of a state of emergency, the hearing on the motion for summary judgment is continued to April 20, 2020 at 1:30 pm.  Moving party is to give notice.