This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/24/2021 at 04:05:52 (UTC).

CATALINA ARQUILLA, ET AL. VS RIO HONDO HEALTHCARE, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/29/2021 CATALINA ARQUILLA filed a Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse lawsuit against RIO HONDO HEALTHCARE, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7936

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

ARQUILLA CATALINA

CATALINA ARQUILLA AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO JAMES ARQUILLA

Respondents

FLAGSTONE HEALTHCARE SOUTH LLC

RIO HONDO HEALTHCARE INC. DBA DOWNEY POST ACUTE

THE ENSIGN GROUP INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SMITH DAWN

Respondent Attorney

MCGILL ASHLEY S.

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

7/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition - COMPLAINT

7/29/2021: Petition - COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

8/4/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/4/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/4/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

9/1/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Rio Hondo Healthcare, Inc. (Respondent); Flagstone Healthcare, South, LLC (Respondent); The Ensign Group, Inc. (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Catalina Arquilla (Petitioner); Catalina Arquilla, as Successor-in-Interest to James Arquilla (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Catalina Arquilla (Petitioner); Catalina Arquilla, as Successor-in-Interest to James Arquilla (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Catalina Arquilla (Petitioner); Catalina Arquilla, as Successor-in-Interest to James Arquilla (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Petition); Filed by Catalina Arquilla (Petitioner); Catalina Arquilla, as Successor-in-Interest to James Arquilla (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Catalina Arquilla (Petitioner); Catalina Arquilla, as Successor-in-Interest to James Arquilla (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Catalina Arquilla (Petitioner); Catalina Arquilla, as Successor-in-Interest to James Arquilla (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Catalina Arquilla (Petitioner); Catalina Arquilla, as Successor-in-Interest to James Arquilla (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SIGNUM HEALTHCARE SOUTH LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where THE ENSIGN GROUP INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCGILL ASHLEY S.