This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2023 at 07:01:52 (UTC).

CASTLE & COOKE AVIATION SERVICES VS. QBE INSURANCE, ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/15/2018 CASTLE COOKE AVIATION SERVICES filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against QBE INSURANCE,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SHIRLEY K. WATKINS. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6877

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SHIRLEY K. WATKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

UNITED STATES AVIATION UNDERWRITERS INC.

CASTLE & COOK AVIATION SERVICES INC.

Defendant

QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TERHAR MICHAEL JOHN

CUNNINGHAM M. ROSS

Defendant Attorney

LAMONTAGNE RALPH STUART JR

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/13/2019: Request for Dismissal

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

7/24/2019: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Settlement

7/24/2019: Notice of Settlement

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/15/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/15/2018: Complaint

Summons

2/15/2018: Summons

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/15/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Related Case

2/20/2018: Notice of Related Case

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

2/23/2018: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Notice of Related Case

3/8/2018: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-03-26 00:00:00

3/26/2018: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-03-26 00:00:00

Request for Judicial Notice

3/29/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Declaration

3/29/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Declaration

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

3/29/2018: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Demurrer

3/29/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Demurrer

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Declaration

4/4/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Declaration

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

4/4/2018: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Request for Judicial Notice

4/4/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/14/2019

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 09/06/2019 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department T Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/14/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/13/2019

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Castle & Cook Aviation Services, Inc. (Plaintiff); United States Aviation Underwriters, Inc. (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/13/2019

DocketOn the Complaint filed by CASTLE & COOKE AVIATION SERVICES on 02/15/2018, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Castle & Cook Aviation Services, Inc. and United States Aviation Underwriters, Inc. as to the entire action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2019

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 09/06/2019 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department T

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2019

DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2019

DocketAddress for Michael John Terhar (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2019

DocketAddress for Ralph Stuart LaMontagne, Jr (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2019

DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: Castle & Cook Aviation Services, Inc. (Plaintiff); United States Aviation Underwriters, Inc. (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2019

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/13/2019 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department T Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 07/24/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2019

DocketHearing on Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for 10/16/2019 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department T Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 07/24/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
110 More Docket Entries
03/26/2018

DocketMinute order entered: 2018-03-26 00:00:00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/26/2018

DocketProceeding/Event:Order Re: Related Cases John J. Kralik 8:30 am

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2018

DocketDocument:Notice-Related Cases Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2018

DocketDocument:Proof of Service-Summons & Com Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/20/2018

DocketDocument:Notice-Related Cases Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2018

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Castle & Cook Aviation Services, Inc. (Plaintiff); United States Aviation Underwriters, Inc. (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2018

DocketDocument:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2018

DocketDocument:Summons Issued Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2018

DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2018

DocketCase Filed/Opened:Ins Coverage (not Complex)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less