This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/14/2019 at 07:44:58 (UTC).

CASTILLO, MONICA I VS MARIN, ALEX

Case Summary

On 01/24/2017 CASTILLO, MONICA I filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MARIN, ALEX. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4352

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CASTILLO MONICA I

Respondent

MARIN ALEX

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2018
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Request - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Castillo, Monica ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 03-02-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Castillo, Monica ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Castillo, Monica ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Castillo, Monica ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Castillo, Monica - Granted on 2017-01-24 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Castillo, Monica ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Notice (of Case Assignment to DEPT F46 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Declaration (Property - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Castillo, Monica ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less