This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/28/2020 at 11:14:01 (UTC).

CASTILLO BATAILLE VS WANTMYLOOK, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/03/2018 CASTILLO BATAILLE filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against WANTMYLOOK, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9526

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Defendants and Plaintiffs

BATAILLE CASTILLO

MALOUF KERRY

WANTMYLOOK INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HALL TIMOTHY A.

MUSE ROGER Y.

HALL TIMOTHY ANDREW

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & POS

9/23/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & POS

Judgment

7/31/2019: Judgment

Judgment - JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT - BEFORE TRIAL - 07/31/2019 ENTERED FOR PLAINTIFF BATAILLE, CASTILLO AGAINST DEFENDANT WANTMYLOOK, INC..

7/31/2019: Judgment - JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT - BEFORE TRIAL - 07/31/2019 ENTERED FOR PLAINTIFF BATAILLE, CASTILLO AGAINST DEFENDANT WANTMYLOOK, INC..

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

7/31/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE PROPOSED JUDGMENTS)

7/31/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE PROPOSED JUDGMENTS)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/18/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Brief - BRIEF 2. EVIDENCE ISO SUPPLEMENTAL DEFAULT PROVE-UP BRIEF (SIGNED)

5/24/2019: Brief - BRIEF 2. EVIDENCE ISO SUPPLEMENTAL DEFAULT PROVE-UP BRIEF (SIGNED)

Brief - BRIEF 1. SUPPLEMENTAL DEFAULT PROVE-UP BRIEF (SIGNED)

5/24/2019: Brief - BRIEF 1. SUPPLEMENTAL DEFAULT PROVE-UP BRIEF (SIGNED)

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

5/24/2019: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/24/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Mail

5/24/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE DEFAULT 585 PACKET)

6/7/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE DEFAULT 585 PACKET)

Request for Dismissal

3/15/2019: Request for Dismissal

Brief - BRIEF PLAINTIFFS' DEFAULT PROVE-UP BRIEF

3/15/2019: Brief - BRIEF PLAINTIFFS' DEFAULT PROVE-UP BRIEF

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

3/15/2019: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Proof of Service by Mail

3/15/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Brief - BRIEF PLAINTIFFS' EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' DEFAULT PROVE-UP BRIEF

3/15/2019: Brief - BRIEF PLAINTIFFS' EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' DEFAULT PROVE-UP BRIEF

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE DEFAULT 585 PACKET)

3/29/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE DEFAULT 585 PACKET)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Entry of Judgment & POS); Filed by KERRY MALOUF (Plaintiff); CASTILLO BATAILLE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • Docketat 11:39 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Status Conference (re Proposed Judgments) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference re Proposed Judgments)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketJudgment (- Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 07/31/2019 entered for Plaintiff BATAILLE, CASTILLO against Defendant WANTMYLOOK, INC..); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Docketat 2:50 PM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Status Conference (re Default 585 Packet) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketComplaint For Penalities for the Late Payment of Wages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketSummons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by KERRY MALOUF (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WANTMYLOOK INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MUSE ROGER Y.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HALL TIMOTHY A