This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 01:18:46 (UTC).

CASTANEDA, MARTHA BELMONTES VS NAVA, GABRIEL ALONSO VENEGAS

Case Summary

On 02/05/2019 CASTANEDA, MARTHA BELMONTES filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against NAVA, GABRIEL ALONSO VENEGAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GORDON, SCOTT M. and LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0002

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GORDON, SCOTT M.

LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CASTANEDA MARTHA BELMONTES

Respondent

NAVA GABRIEL ALONSO VENEGAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ARIAS JESUS EDUARDO

Respondent Attorneys

YOUNGMAN LAUREN OLIVIA

REITSHTEIN RON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

04/17/2019

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 88, Gordon, Scott M., Presiding; Hearing - Granted

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2019

DocketStipulation and Order - No Fee (SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ); Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2019

DocketProof of Service; Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2019

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/16/2019

DocketOpposition; Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2019

DocketNotice - Court Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2019

DocketReply; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2019

DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2019

DocketOpposition; Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2019

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Lewis, Thomas Trent, Presiding; Ex Parte Hearing - Transfer - Different Department- This Hearing Only

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2019

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 88, Gordon, Scott M., Presiding; Conference - Held - Order Made

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2019

DocketEx Parte - Application; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2019

DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2019

DocketOrder (TEMPORARY EMERGENCY EX PARTE ORDERS: HAGUE CONVENTION PROCEEDINGS (TEMPORARY ORDERS) ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2019

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2019

DocketResponsive Declaration (TO EX PARTE ); Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2019

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2019

DocketPetition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2019

DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less