This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/17/2023 at 22:44:06 (UTC).

CASSANDRA LIMON VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SURGICAL CENTER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/03/2022 CASSANDRA LIMON filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SURGICAL CENTER,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7830

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LIMON CASSANDRA

Defendants

GOMEZ-GARCIA MD ANGEL

LATINA MEDSPA CORP

PEREZ LATORRE SA-C CRISTIAN

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SURGICAL CENTER

VELEZ MD ANTERO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GEROME BRENT

KREMER CARL

Defendant Attorneys

MCANDREWS THOMAS FRANCIS

GUZ EVAN

BRADFORD THOMAS ROBERT

KELLY JOHN

SCHAFER TERRENCE JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/3/2022: Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/2/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Change of Firm Name

11/14/2022: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Unknown - REQUEST FOR REFUND / ORDER (EFILING)

8/2/2022: Unknown - REQUEST FOR REFUND / ORDER (EFILING)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/29/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

4/29/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TRIAL COUNSEL ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT, ANGEL GOMEZ-GARCIA, M.D.

4/29/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TRIAL COUNSEL ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT, ANGEL GOMEZ-GARCIA, M.D.

Notice - NOTICE DEMAND FOR EXCHANGE OF EXPERT WITNESS INFORMATION BEFORE TRIAL

4/29/2022: Notice - NOTICE DEMAND FOR EXCHANGE OF EXPERT WITNESS INFORMATION BEFORE TRIAL

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/29/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

4/29/2022: Answer

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER RE PUNITIVE DAMAGES CLAIMS IN COMPLAINT

5/9/2022: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER RE PUNITIVE DAMAGES CLAIMS IN COMPLAINT

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

5/10/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

Demand for Jury Trial

5/10/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

5/10/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/10/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION RE PUNITIVE DAMAGES CLAIMS IN COURT

5/23/2022: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION RE PUNITIVE DAMAGES CLAIMS IN COURT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/25/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/25/2022: Proof of Personal Service

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2025
  • Hearing02/27/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2023
  • Hearing08/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • Hearing08/17/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Southern California Surgical Center (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by: Antero Velez, MD (Defendant); New Firm Name: PETERSON, BRADFORD, BURKWITZ GREGORIO, BURKWITZ & SU, LLP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Thomas Robert Bradford (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Peterson Bradford Burkwitz to PETERSON, BRADFORD, BURKWITZ GREGORIO, BURKWITZ & SU, LLP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Refund / Order (eFiling): Result Date changed from 08/08/2022 to 09/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Refund / Order (eFiling): Status Date changed from 08/02/2022 to 08/02/2022; Filed By: Cristian Perez LaTorre, SA-C (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 08/08/2022; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Latina MedSpa Corp (Defendant); As to: Cassandra Limon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of Trial Attorney; Filed by: Latina MedSpa Corp (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Cassandra Limon (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Surgical Center (Defendant); Latina MedSpa Corp (Defendant); Cristian Perez LaTorre, SA-C (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Cassandra Limon (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Surgical Center (Defendant); Latina MedSpa Corp (Defendant); Cristian Perez LaTorre, SA-C (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Cassandra Limon (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Surgical Center (Defendant); Latina MedSpa Corp (Defendant); Cristian Perez LaTorre, SA-C (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less