This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/16/2022 at 05:20:43 (UTC).

CASEY, MEGAN C. VS CASEY, BEAU J,

Case Summary

On 07/24/2020 CASEY, MEGAN C filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against CASEY, BEAU J,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RIFF, LAWRENCE P., BOXER, DOREEN B. and SWIFT, DAVID W.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3842

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RIFF, LAWRENCE P.

BOXER, DOREEN B.

SWIFT, DAVID W.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CASEY MEGAN C.

Respondent

CASEY BEAU J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SCHNEIDER JULIA DREY

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

9/1/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Stipulation and Order

9/17/2021: Stipulation and Order

Request - Stipulated Request RE Continuance and Long Cause

7/28/2021: Request - Stipulated Request RE Continuance and Long Cause

Order - Temporary Emergency

7/28/2021: Order - Temporary Emergency

Ex Parte - Application - RFO Temporary Emergency Orders Continuance and Assignment Of Hearing as Long Cause

7/28/2021: Ex Parte - Application - RFO Temporary Emergency Orders Continuance and Assignment Of Hearing as Long Cause

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given)

7/28/2021: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given)

Minute Order

8/31/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/28/2021: Minute Order

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

6/22/2021: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

6/22/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

6/22/2021: Minute Order

Stipulation and Order

2/26/2021: Stipulation and Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

3/2/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Stipulation - for Continuance of Hearing on Restraining Order

3/9/2021: Stipulation - for Continuance of Hearing on Restraining Order

Minute Order

3/2/2021: Minute Order

Stipulation and Order

11/16/2020: Stipulation and Order

Stipulation and Order

1/6/2021: Stipulation and Order

Stipulation and Order

1/6/2021: Stipulation and Order

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 59, Swift, David W., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Off Calendar - No Appearance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 59, Riff, Lawrence P., Presiding; Ex Parte Hearing - Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketOrder (Temporary Emergency ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketRequest (Stipulated Request RE Continuance and Long Cause ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketEx Parte - Application (RFO Temporary Emergency Orders Continuance and Assignment Of Hearing as Long Cause ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (for Continuance of Hearing on Restraining Order ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (DV-109, DV-100, DV-110, FL-150 ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketOrder - Attend Mediation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHNEIDER JULIA DREY