This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2019 at 01:47:00 (UTC).

CASEY CROW COLLECTIVE VS CITY OF LONG BEACH ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/18/2018 CASEY CROW COLLECTIVE filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against CITY OF LONG BEACH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JAMES C. CHALFANT and SAMANTHA JESSNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2171

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JAMES C. CHALFANT

SAMANTHA JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COLLECTIVE CASEY CROW

Defendants

LONG BEACH CITY OF

CSC HOLDINGS LLC

ELEVATED EXPERIENCE INC

Not Classified By Court

FRANCY'S CHRIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ORMONG RICHARD P.

AUGUSTINI JEFF

Defendant Attorneys

SEGRETI LOUIS MICHAEL

SANCHEZ ARTURO DIAZ

NASH VICKI ANNE

BULEY MICHAEL J.

SMITH KEVIN LEE

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

1/19/2018: SUMMONS

PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SERVE SECRETARY OF STATE AS TO DEFENDANT ELEVATED EXPERIENCE, INC., ETC

5/31/2018: PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SERVE SECRETARY OF STATE AS TO DEFENDANT ELEVATED EXPERIENCE, INC., ETC

AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

5/31/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

5/31/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

5/31/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

5/31/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

DECLARATION OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE

5/31/2018: DECLARATION OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE

ORDER FOR SERVICE UPON THE SECRETARY OF STATE [CORPORATIONS CODE SECTIONS 1702, 2111 AND 17701.16]

6/4/2018: ORDER FOR SERVICE UPON THE SECRETARY OF STATE [CORPORATIONS CODE SECTIONS 1702, 2111 AND 17701.16]

Minute Order

6/7/2018: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/19/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

RECORD OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

7/6/2018: RECORD OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

PLAINTIFF CASEY CROW COLLECTIVE'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT CSC HOLDINGS, LLC AND; ETC.

7/12/2018: PLAINTIFF CASEY CROW COLLECTIVE'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT CSC HOLDINGS, LLC AND; ETC.

DECLARATION OF JEFF AUGUSTINI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF CASEY CROW COLLECTIVE'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANTS CSC HOLDINGS, LLC AND; ETC.

7/12/2018: DECLARATION OF JEFF AUGUSTINI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF CASEY CROW COLLECTIVE'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANTS CSC HOLDINGS, LLC AND; ETC.

DECLARATION OF JEFF AUGUSTINI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF CASEY CROW COLLECTIVE'S MOTION TO OVERRULE OBJECTIONS AND TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES FROM CSC HOLDINGS, LLC TO FIRST SET OF FORM INTERROGATORIES;

7/24/2018: DECLARATION OF JEFF AUGUSTINI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF CASEY CROW COLLECTIVE'S MOTION TO OVERRULE OBJECTIONS AND TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES FROM CSC HOLDINGS, LLC TO FIRST SET OF FORM INTERROGATORIES;

PLAINTIFF CASEY CROW COLLECTIVE'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO OVERRULE OBJECTIONS AND TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES FROM CSC HOLDINGS, LLC TO FIRST SET OF FORM INTERROGATORIES; AND FOR THE IMPOSITION

7/24/2018: PLAINTIFF CASEY CROW COLLECTIVE'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO OVERRULE OBJECTIONS AND TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES FROM CSC HOLDINGS, LLC TO FIRST SET OF FORM INTERROGATORIES; AND FOR THE IMPOSITION

PLAINTIFF CASEY CROW COLLECTIVE'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ITEMS TN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO OVERRULE OBJECTIONS AND TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES FROM CSC HOLDINGS LLC TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AND F

7/24/2018: PLAINTIFF CASEY CROW COLLECTIVE'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ITEMS TN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO OVERRULE OBJECTIONS AND TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES FROM CSC HOLDINGS LLC TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AND F

VERIFIED ANSWER OF ELEVATED EXPERIENCE INC. TO CASEY CROW COLLECTIVE'S VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND COMPLAINT

7/25/2018: VERIFIED ANSWER OF ELEVATED EXPERIENCE INC. TO CASEY CROW COLLECTIVE'S VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND COMPLAINT

Minute Order

8/7/2018: Minute Order

92 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Casey Crow Collective (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by City of Long Beach (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference and Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketMemorandum (of Costs (Worksheet)); Filed by City of Long Beach (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 1, Samantha Jessner, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court) of 06/25/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Casey Crow Collective (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 85, James C. Chalfant, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (After Demurrer is Sustained Without Leave to Amend) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketOther - (Decision on (1) motion to strike FAP: granted in part; (2) Elevated's demurrer to FAP; sustained in part; (3) City's demurrer to FAP: sustained); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
139 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Casey Crow Collective (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Casey Crow Collective (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Casey Crow Collective (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketVERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND COMPLAINT FOR: (1) PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDAMUS; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketPetition; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

ORMGINAL T

S"Pen'oiill E D : Counp, n(:“l;n of Caljf,, . Kevin Smith, Esq. (Bar No. 128017) i Angejeg 2845 W. Valley Blvd. ’ S’?ern’},L " 05 2018 Alhambra, California 91803 By e e

Telephone: (562) 308-0300 S o, cer/ Facsimile: (626) 289-7100 e De [y, Dep,

Attorney for Defendant CSC HOLDINGS, LLC

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

CASEY CROW COLLECTIVE, a California corporation,

Case No.: BS172171

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT CSC’S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND COMPLAINT

Plaintiff,

VS. CITY OF LONG BEACH; ELEVATED EXPERIENCE INC., a California corporation;

CSC HOLDINGS, LLC, a California limited hiability company; and DOES 1-25, inclusive,

Defendants.

' Nt st st e

PROOF OF SERVICE

I am employed in the County of Los Angeles, State of California. I am over the age of 8 years and not a party to the within action; my business address is: 2845 W. Valley Blvd., Alhambra, CA 98103.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT CSC HOLDINGS, LLC’s ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO VERIFIED

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ELEVATED EXPERIENCE INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CSC Holdings, LLC d/b/a Altice Technical Services USA is a litigant

Latest cases where LONG BEACH CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ORMOND RICHARD PAUL