This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2023 at 06:40:28 (UTC).

CASEY ALEXANDER VS AARP, A DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/27/2022 CASEY ALEXANDER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AARP, A DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0242

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALEXANDER CASEY

Defendants

AARP A DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA CORPORATION

AARP SERVICES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

ACCOMPLICE MEDIA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

INTEG:ADVISORS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

NEXSTAR INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

THE ADVERTISING COUNCIL INC. A NEW YORK CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MUSE ROGER Y.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/27/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/27/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/27/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/27/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

12/27/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

12/27/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

12/27/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/30/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Request for Dismissal

3/10/2023: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

03/13/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/26/2023 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 50 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/13/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2023

DocketOn the Complaint filed by CASEY ALEXANDER on 12/27/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by CASEY ALEXANDER as to the entire action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2023

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: CASEY ALEXANDER (Plaintiff); As to: AARP, a District of Columbia corporation (Defendant); AARP SERVICES INC., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); THE ADVERTISING COUNCIL, INC., a New York corporation (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/30/2022

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/26/2023 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 50

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/30/2022

DocketAddress for Roger Y. Muse (Attorney) null

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/30/2022

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2022

DocketComplaint; Filed by: CASEY ALEXANDER (Plaintiff); As to: AARP, a District of Columbia corporation (Defendant); AARP SERVICES INC., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); THE ADVERTISING COUNCIL, INC., a New York corporation (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2022

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CASEY ALEXANDER (Plaintiff); As to: AARP, a District of Columbia corporation (Defendant); AARP SERVICES INC., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); THE ADVERTISING COUNCIL, INC., a New York corporation (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2022

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CASEY ALEXANDER (Plaintiff); As to: AARP, a District of Columbia corporation (Defendant); AARP SERVICES INC., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); THE ADVERTISING COUNCIL, INC., a New York corporation (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2022

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2022

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2022

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2022

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2022

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Teresa A. Beaudet in Department 50 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less