This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/21/2023 at 10:48:59 (UTC).

HUGO MARTINEZ CASTILLO VS NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/25/2023 HUGO MARTINEZ CASTILLO filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1851

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINEZ CASTILLO HUGO

Defendant

NISSAN NORTH AMERICA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOBSON KEVIN Y.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/25/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/25/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/25/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/25/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/25/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/25/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/25/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/25/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/25/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

5/26/2023: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE)

5/30/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE) OF 05/30/2023

5/30/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE) OF 05/30/2023

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

5/30/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Proof of Personal Service

5/31/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/6/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2023
  • Hearing11/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Hugo Martinez Castillo (Plaintiff); As to: Nissan North America, Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 05/30/2023; Service Cost: 30.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6): Filed By: Hugo Martinez Castillo (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 05/30/2023 ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 45 - Hon. Mel Red Recana; Reason: Challenge / Recusal, by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order re Peremptory Challenge) of 05/30/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order re Peremptory Challenge)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/28/2023 at 09:45 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/30/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Kevin Y. Jacobson (Attorney): Middle Name: Y.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketAddress for Kevin Y. Jacobson (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Hugo Martinez Castillo (Plaintiff); As to: Nissan North America, Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Hugo Martinez Castillo (Plaintiff); As to: Nissan North America, Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/28/2023 at 09:45 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less